+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- House Conference Comm Appointed
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Conference Comm Appointed
- Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amend
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ refuse to concur in Senate amendment
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 8, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 30, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 21, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 20, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2009: House Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
February 25, 2009: Senate Conference Comm Rpt Adopted
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
February 12, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor