+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (4)
House Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 4
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Passed
Senate Amendment # 3
Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2012: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2012: House/ floor amendment
February 29, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor