+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 6, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 4, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 18, 2005: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor