+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor