+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Vote
February 25, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor