+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ amended/ placed on Consent
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 21, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2006: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 16, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 10, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
January 18, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor