+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 3
- House/ circled
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ circled
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment 2
Passed
House Floor Amendment 1
Failed
+ − Votes (12)
March 4, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2016: House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4
February 18, 2016: House/ floor amendment failed
February 18, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 3
February 18, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 4, 2016: House/ circled
February 4, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 3
January 25, 2016: House/ motion to reconsider
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor