+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (62)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Conference Committee - Final Passage
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- House/ to Senate
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information
- Senate/ to House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 1 to # 2
- Conference Committee Report
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (13)
February 17, 2021: House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2021: House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
February 16, 2021: Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2021: Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
February 12, 2021: House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment
February 11, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 11, 2021: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 11, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
February 10, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 9, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 9, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor