+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On March 5, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor