+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ lifted from Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
March 2, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor