+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 3
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 7, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2016: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 3
March 4, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor