+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ substituted by Rules Committee
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor