+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2016: House/ floor amendment
March 7, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 2
March 7, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 9
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor