+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ floor amendment # 3
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ lifted from standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House/ lifted from Rules
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
March 3, 2022: Senate/ circled
March 3, 2022: Senate/ floor amendment # 3
March 3, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2022: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 3, 2022: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2022: Senate/ uncircled
March 1, 2022: House/ uncircled
March 1, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2022: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 1, 2022: House/ circled
February 28, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor