+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2012: Senate/ circled
March 7, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 10
March 7, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor