+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 7, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor