+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2017: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor