+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
March 1, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor