+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor