+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 21, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2011: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
January 28, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 6
January 25, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor