+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 19, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
On December 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 15, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 6, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor