+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2015: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 20, 2015: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 20, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 4, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
January 30, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor