+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 10, 2015: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor