+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 7, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor