+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2020: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2020: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor