+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 3, 2022: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2022: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2022: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2022: House/ uncircled
February 25, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2022: House/ circled
February 23, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor