+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2012: House/ uncircled
March 2, 2012: House/ substituted
March 2, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
March 1, 2012: House/ circled
March 1, 2012: House/ floor amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor