+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor