+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (11)
March 9, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
March 9, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
March 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 9, 2016: Senate/ substituted
March 4, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2016: House/ substituted
March 1, 2016: House/ circled
March 1, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 29, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor