+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ failed
- House/ filed
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2016: House/ failed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 52
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor