+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received from General Counsel
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor