+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Held
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 27, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor