+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 8, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 7, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 31, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor