+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On December 27, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 20, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On December 14, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 11, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 30, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On November 19, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 15, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 4, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor