+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 4
March 4, 2020: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor