+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 27, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 29
February 22, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor