+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor