+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor