+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2015: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
March 12, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 14
March 12, 2015: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
March 9, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 4, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor