+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to Senate
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 18, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
January 19, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor