+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ returned to Rules
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ passed 2nd and 3rd readings/ suspension
- House/ to Senate
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- House/ circled
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (11)
February 25, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 25, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 25, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 19, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 11, 2016: House/ passed 2nd and 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2016: House/ circled
February 9, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 27, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor