+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: House/ failed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2016: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor