+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
March 5, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor