+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Vote
February 21, 2008: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor