+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 26, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2022: Senate/ circled
March 2, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2022: Senate/ uncircled
February 28, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2022: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor