+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 2, 2021: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor