+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2021: House/ circled
March 2, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor