+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ failed
- House/ filed
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2017: House/ failed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 2
February 28, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor