+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 9, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 17, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 11, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 30, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
January 22, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
January 20, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor