+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ to House
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2016: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor